VA HB1112 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-27 - Senate: Continued to 2013 in Education and Health
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Human papillomavirus vaccination; eliminates requirement. Eliminates the requirement for vaccination against human papillomavirus for female children.
Title
Human papillomavirus vaccine; eliminates requirement of vaccination for female children.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] |
Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Rick Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Previous question, not ordered (16-Y 23-N) (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N 1-A) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (34-Y 63-N 1-A) (Y: 34 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (67-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Previous question, not ordered (16-Y 23-N) (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N 1-A) (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (34-Y 63-N 1-A) (Y: 34 N: 65 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (67-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Senate: Continued to 2013 in Education and Health | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Pursuant to Senate Rule 20(g) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Recommitted to Education and Health | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (22-Y 17-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Previous question, not ordered (16-Y 23-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105552D-S1 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105552D-S1 | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Care | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-27 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 34-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House (62-Y 34-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-01-26 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (34-Y 63-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Amendment by Delegate Stolle rejected (34-Y 63-N 1-A) | |
2012-01-26 | House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (67-Y 30-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Previous question ordered (67-Y 30-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Speaker ruled Amendments by Delegate Stolle out of order | |
2012-01-26 | House: Passed by motion rejected | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-24 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (14-Y 8-N) | |
2012-01-19 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12104038D |