VA HB111 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting on Sunday; wildlife management areas. Allows hunting on Sundays in wildlife management areas owned by the Department of Wildlife Resources. Hunting on Sunday; wildlife management areas. Allows hunting on Sundays in wildlife management areas owned by the Department of Wildlife Resources.
Title
Hunting on Sunday; wildlife management areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2022-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2022-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103739D |