VA HB1109 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Overtime compensation; penalties. Requires an employer to compensate its employees who are entitled to overtime compensation under the federal Fair Labor Standards Act at a rate (i) not less than one and one-half times the employee's regular rate of pay for any hours worked in excess of 40 hours in any one workweek and (ii) not less than twice the employee's regular rate of pay for (a) any hours worked in excess of 12 hours in one workday and (b) any hours worked on the seventh day of work in any workweek to the extent that the hours worked on such day exceed 40 hours worked in such week. The sanctions for an employer's failure to pay such overtime wages, including civil and criminal penalties, are the same as currently provided for failing to pay wages generally.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wages; payment for overtime work, penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-02-06HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-23HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104600D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40129(n/a)See Bill Text
40129.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback