VA HB110 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Business, professional and occupational license tax; gross receipts or Virginia taxable income. Allows localities to decide whether to impose the BPOL tax on a business's gross receipts or its Virginia taxable income.
Title
BPOL tax; localities to decide to impose on business's gross receipts or its State taxable income.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #2 | |
2010-01-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-05 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100925D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB110 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB110+hil |