VA HB1099 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local meals tax and food and beverage tax. Exempts nonprofit entities from collecting meals tax or food and beverage tax on the first $100,000 of otherwise taxable fundraising sales.
Title
Local meals, & food & beverage taxes; exempts nonprofit entity from collecting on fundraising sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 673 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1099ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2014-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1099H2 |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-05 | House | Substitute by Delegate Farrell agreed to 14104817D-H2 |
2014-02-05 | House | Committee substitute rejected 14104753D-H1 |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Floor substitute printed 14104817D-H2 (Farrell) |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104753D-H1 |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14102482D |
Subjects
Charitable, Civic and Volunteer Institutions, and Organizations
Food and Beverage Products, and Containers
Taxation
Food and Beverage Products, and Containers
Taxation