VA HB1097 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Psychiatric treatment of minors. Eliminates the requirement that a minor who is 14 years of age or older consent to psychiatric treatment. Currently, minors 14 years of age or older must consent to treatment or be involuntarily admitted for treatment.
Title
Psychiatric treatment of minors; eliminates requirement that minor consent to treatment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14101971D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 336 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 337 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 338 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 339 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 340.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 341 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 342 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 345 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 345.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 345.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB1097 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB1097+hil |