VA HB1089 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Equal Pay Act. Creates the Virginia Equal Pay Act (the Act), which prohibits private employers from discriminating between employees on the basis of membership in a "protected class," defined in the bill as a group of persons distinguished by race, color, religion, sex, sexual orientation, national origin, marital status, veteran status, disability, or age, in the payment of wages or other compensation for substantially similar work. The bill also prohibits (i) discrimination between employees by providing less favorable employment opportunities; (ii) limitation of an employee's right to discuss wages; (iii) infringement on an employee's right to not disclose wage or salary history; and (iv) retaliation against an employee who opposes an act or practice made unlawful by the Act, makes or intends to file a complaint under the Act, or assists in an investigation or proceeding under the Act. The bill also establishes (a) criteria for when wage differentials between employees can occur, (b) remedies for individuals aggrieved by a violation of the Act, and (c) provisions for enforcement of the Act. The bill contains a technical amendment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Equal Pay Act; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2018-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2018-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104684D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40128.13(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.17(n/a)See Bill Text
40128.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback