VA HB1062 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Employment Commission; representation of Commonwealth. Provides that the Office of the Attorney General may represent the interests of the Commonwealth in hearings conducted before the Virginia Employment Commission regarding an employer's tax liability. Currently, the Office of the Attorney General's representation in such hearings is mandatory.
Title
Virginia Employment Commission; Office of Attorney General may represent interests of State.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0065) | |
2012-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 65 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-17 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-17 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1062ER) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-19 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101672D |
Same As/Similar To
SB295 (Same As) 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
Subjects
Attorney General
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Labor and Employment
Unemployment Compensation
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Labor and Employment
Unemployment Compensation