VA HB1060 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Arresting officer to ascertain citizenship of arrestee. Supplements the existing law that requires sheriffs to make a query into legal presence when a person is "taken into custody" at a jail. This bill expands such inquiries by requiring that an arresting officer inquire of every arrestee whether he is in the country legally. The bill further provides that when a law-enforcement officer believes that the person is not legally present in the United States, he shall communicate to the judicial officer the facts and circumstances underlying his belief.
Title
Citizenship of arrestee; if accused is not committed to jail, arresting officer to ascertain.
Sponsors
Del. Richard Anderson [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. John Cox [R] | Del. Anne Crockett-Stark [R] |
Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Charles Poindexter [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 7-N) (Y: 7 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 7-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 25-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (75-Y 25-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1060H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Pending question ordered | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105239D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105239D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102414D |