VA HB105 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Contests of election for certain elections; service of process. Requires that contestees in a contest of (i) a primary election for the United States House of Representatives, the General Assembly, or a local office or (ii) any election for a local office be served by the contestant with a copy of the complaint within 30 days following the date of the election in the case of a general election and within 10 days following the date of the election in the case of a primary or special election held on a date other than that of a general election.
Title
Contests of election for certain elections; service of process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0014) | |
2016-02-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 14 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Wednesday, February 24, 2016 | |
2016-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/16 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB105ER) |
2016-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-29 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-12-15 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101462D |
Same As/Similar To
SB316 (Same As) 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0490)