VA HB1047 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; definition of manufactured home park. Reduces from 10 to five the minimum number of manufactured homes on a parcel of land under single or common ownership that meets the definition of a manufactured home park subject to the Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act (?§55-248.41 et seq.).
Title
Manufactured Home Lot Rental Act; definition of manufactured home park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0408) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 408 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1047ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102779D |