VA HB1044 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Burial fees for military spouses. Provides that, from such funds as may be appropriated, the Commonwealth shall pay the burial fees for any spouse or surviving spouse of an active duty member or veteran of the United States Armed Forces buried at a veterans cemetery operated by the Department of Veterans Services.
Title
Military spouses; burial fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104245D |