VA HB104 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; officers of elections; chief and assistant chief election officers. Allows the chief and assistant chief election officers to be nonpartisan if a representative for one or both of the two political parties receiving the highest and next highest number of votes in the preceding gubernatorial election is unavailable. The bill requires that notice be given to representatives of both political parties at least 10 days prior to the election that the electoral board intends to use nonaffiliated officers so that the political parties have the opportunity to provide additional nominations for election officers.
Title
Chief and assistant chief election officers; appointment, qualifications and terms of officers.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 777 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB104ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB104ER) |
2014-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105151D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB104S1 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105151D-S1 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105151D-S1 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-22 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 14101695D-E |
2014-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB104E |
2014-01-21 | House | Amendment by Delegate Cole agreed to |
2014-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-17 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2013-12-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-12-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101695D |