VA HB1030 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility regulation; pilot program for undergrounding electrical transmission lines. Provides that the State Corporation Commission's approval of a proposed transmission line for inclusion in a pilot program established as part of the Grid Transformation and Security Act enacted in 2018 (i) precludes the placement of future overhead electrical transmission lines of at least 69 kilovolts in the same area or corridor by other transmission projects for a period of 10 years and (ii) does not preclude (a) any underground transmission lines in such right-of-way or (b) any electrical distribution lines in such right-of-way. The pilot program provides for the underground construction of two electrical transmission lines, including one for the Haymarket transmission line project in Prince William County.
Title
Electrical transmission lines; placement of overhead and underground lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1030ER) |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1030H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106440D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106440D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101252D |