VA HB1027 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility rates; added returns. Eliminates provisions of the Virginia Electric Utility Regulation Act that authorize investor-owned electric utilities to earn added basis points and other performance incentives that would increase the utility's fair combined rate of return on common equity above the rate determined by the Commission in biennial rate review proceedings. Currently, such utilities are authorized to return performance incentives and enhanced rates of return on common equity if they satisfy performance standards, make certain investments in generation facilities, and successfully participate in a renewable energy program.
Title
Investor-owned electric utilities; rate of return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2010-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (11-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-29 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101489D |