VA HB1026 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Check cashers; recordkeeping requirements; civil penalty. Requires each registered check casher to make copies of, or maintain a record of information from, each item cashed and the customer's identification document prior to cashing the item. Records for each transaction are required to be retained for six months. A violation of these requirements is punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $100. The measure does not apply to registered check cashers that are principally engaged in the bona fide retail sale of goods or services.
Title
Check cashers; recordkeeping requirements, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0768) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 768 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1026ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-06 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-06 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1026H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104526D-H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104526D-H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100106D |