VA HB1014 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; filling vacancies in certain local offices; special elections. Provides that vacancies in a governing body or elected school board shall be filled by special election. If the vacant position is not that of a constitutional officer, the position may be filled temporarily by an interim appointment. The requirement for a special election overrides charter provisions that allow a governing body or school board to appoint a person to serve the entire remaining portion of a term. An exemption from the requirement to hold a special election for towns with a population of 3,500 or less is removed.
Title
Elections; filling vacancies in certain local offices, requirements for special elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0431) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 431 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1014ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-11 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105619D-S1 (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1014S1 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105619D-S1 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105619D-S1 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-15 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | House: Printed as engrossed 10102168D-E | |
2010-02-12 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1014E | |
2010-02-12 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-12 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-09 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102168D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 682 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |