VA HB1012 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers. Expands the definition of "franchised motor vehicle dealer" to include used car dealerships operating under the trademark of a manufacturer. The bill also defines the relevant market area applicable to dealers of heavy trucks and limits the certain control that may be exercised over the development and operation of a motor vehicle dealer's premises due to its franchise relationship with the manufacturer. The bill also addresses certain practices relating to warranty and sales incentive audits to guarantee motor vehicle dealers the right to return parts sent by automated ordering system. It also limits the power of a manufacturer to coerce the waiver of a motor vehicle dealer's rights under any contract or other law; and clarifies hearing procedures. This bill is almost identical to
Title
Motor vehicle dealers and manufacturers; addresses certain practices relating to warranty, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0284) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 284 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1012ER) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-25 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105341D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1012S1 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105341D-S1 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105341D-S1 | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1012H1 | |
2010-02-01 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104770D-H1 | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-28 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104770D-H1 | |
2010-01-28 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103890D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1569 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1571 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1572.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1573 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1573.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1573.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |