VA HB1010 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-04 - Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency medical services providers; certification. Provides that regulations of the Board of Health governing qualifications for certification of emergency medical services providers shall require no more than 40 hours of classroom instruction for certification of an emergency medical services provider as an emergency medical responder or emergency medical services first responder and no more than 80 hours of classroom instruction for certification of an emergency medical services provider as an emergency medical technician. This bill is carried over pursuant to Rule 22 of the House.
Title
Emergency medical services providers; certification.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Continued to 2015 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101596D |