VA HB1008 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property tax exemption; household goods and personal effects. Provides that for any tangible personal property tax exemption provided by a locality, household goods and personal effects owned and used by an individual incident to maintaining a vacation home shall be exempt if the preponderance of use for the vacation home is as a residence for its owners.
Title
Personal property tax; exemption for household goods and personal effects.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104023D |