VA HB1008 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]


Postrelease incarceration for violations of postrelease supervision. Clarifies that when a sentence is imposed upon conviction of a felony that includes an active term of incarceration and the court does not order a suspended term of confinement of at least six months, a period of postrelease incarceration shall be imposed that is not less than six months or more than three years. The bill also clarifies that it is the period of postrelease incarceration that is required to be suspended, not the period of postrelease supervision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Postrelease incarceration; violations of postrelease supervision.


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N) (Y: 2 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2018-03-10HouseFailed to pass
2018-03-10HouseNo further action taken
2018-02-22SenateSenators: Obenshain, Deeds, Sturtevant
2018-02-22SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-02-22HouseDelegates: Gilbert, Bell, Robert B., Mullin
2018-02-22HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-02-20SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-16HouseVOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 94-N)
2018-02-16HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (2-Y 94-N)
2018-02-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-14SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2018-02-14SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-02-14SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-02-14SenateRead third time
2018-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2018-02-12SenateReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-31HouseRead first time
2018-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2018-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101604D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18210(n/a)See Bill Text
192295.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

Bill Comments