VA HB1008 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle fuels sales tax in certain transportation districts; price floor. Places a floor on the 2.1 percent tax imposed on motor vehicle fuels sold in Northern Virginia and Hampton Roads by ensuring that the average sales price be no less than the statewide average sales price on February 20, 2013, which is the date used as a floor on the statewide motor vehicle fuels sales tax.
Title
Motor vehicle fuels; sales tax in certain transportation districts, price floor.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Daun Hester [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Stricken from docket by Finance by voice vote |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101983D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB1008 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB1008+hil |