VA HB1005 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance policies; coverage; conversion policies. Repeals provisions relating to the conversion of coverage under a group policy to an individual policy. The measure also provides that certain mandated offers do not apply to health care plans, contracts, or policies issued in the individual or small group market or to a qualified health plan offered in the Commonwealth by a health carrier through a health benefit exchange. The bill deletes references to individual conversion policies and includes technical and conforming changes.
Title
Health insurance policies; individual and group coverage, conversion policies.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0814) | |
2014-05-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 814 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2014-04-23 | House | Speaker ruled Governor's recommendation not germane |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's substitute printed 14105786D-H1 |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1005ER) |
2014-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102730D-E |
2014-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1005E |
2014-01-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-21 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (19-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102730D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3407.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3414.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3430.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3438 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3541 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3541.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |