VA HB1000 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax exemption; elderly and disabled. Provides that the real property tax exemption for the sole dwelling of the elderly and disabled includes dwellings held by certain trusts. The bill also provides that if a locality establishes income restrictions for the exemption, then the locality shall exclude (i) the income of relatives living in the dwelling providing caregiving services, whether or not they are compensated, and (ii) the income of non-relative caregivers living in the home, whether or not they are compensated.
Title
Real property tax; exemption for certain elderly and disabled persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] | Del. Luke Torian [D] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] |
Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. Michael Webert [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0767) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 767 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1000ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103585D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3211.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |