VA HB1000 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-11-29 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Telework expenses tax credit. Raises the cap on the aggregate amount of tax credits available in calendar years 2012 and 2013 for telework expenses from $1 million to $1.5 million. The bill also raises the cap on the amount of credits that can be claimed by an employer from $50,000 per employer to $75,000 per employer.
Title
Telework expenses tax credit; extended for employers through December 31, 2015.
Sponsors
Del. Brenda Pogge [R] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] | Del. Gordon Helsel [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] |
Del. David Ramadan [R] | Del. Michael Webert [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | House | Left in Finance |
2012-02-10 | House | Continued to 2013 in Finance by voice vote |
2012-02-06 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #3 |
2012-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102018D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:0 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.12:07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1000 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1000+hil |