UT SJR026 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Recognizing the Contributions of the Sundance Institute and the Sundance Film Festival

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Recognizing the Contributions of the Sundance Institute and the Sundance Film Festival

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 Senate/ filed in SFILE
2011-03-10 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-03-10 House/ circled in H3RDSB
2011-03-09 House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB
2011-03-04 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-03-04 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2011-03-04 Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SSPEC
2011-03-03 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2011-03-02 Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTNAE
2011-03-02 Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTNAE
2011-03-02 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE
2011-03-01 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE
2011-03-01 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2011-03-01 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2011-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback