UT SJR020 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Master Study Resolution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Master Study Resolution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House of Representatives - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House of Representatives - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-21 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2014-03-21SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2014-03-20SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2014-03-20SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2014-03-18 Draft of Enrolled Resolution Prepared in LRGCEN
2014-03-16 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2014-03-13HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL
2014-03-13SenateSenate/ received from House in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2014-03-13SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ floor amendment in H3RDSB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB
2014-03-13HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB
2014-03-12HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2014-03-12HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HCLERK
2014-03-12HouseSenate/ to House in HCLERK
2014-03-12HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ uncircled in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ circled in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2014-03-12SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2014-03-12 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2014-03-12 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC
2014-03-12 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SJR020.htm
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sjr020.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillamd/sjr020.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillenr/sjr020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1428&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1455&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1456&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1457&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1458&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1459&house=S&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1079&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1080&house=H&sessionid=2014GS
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?voteid=1574&house=S&sessionid=2014GS

Bill Comments

feedback