UT SJR019 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Supporting Ukrainian Sovereignty
Title
Joint Resolution Supporting Ukrainian Sovereignty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-14 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-11 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-03-10 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-03-10 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-03-10 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |