UT SJR019 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Approving the Houghton Case Final Settlement Agreement
Title
Joint Resolution Approving the Houghton Case Final Settlement Agreement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-14 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-09 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-09 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-03-09 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2011-03-04 | House/ return to Rules due to fiscal impact in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTGOC | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-24 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SCON | |
2011-02-18 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-14 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |