UT SJR016 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution -- Public Education Governance
Title
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution -- Public Education Governance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House/ failed (Y: 18 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ floor amendment failed # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |