UT SJR016 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Rules Resolution - Legislative Compensation and Expense Revisions
Title
Joint Rules Resolution - Legislative Compensation and Expense Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-07 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-07 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-07 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-07 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2014-03-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTGOC |
2014-03-04 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-03-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-02-25 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTGOP |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2014-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL |
2014-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |