UT SJR015 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Rules Resolution -- Federal Revenue Consideration
Title
Joint Rules Resolution -- Federal Revenue Consideration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-03-10 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-03-09 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-03-06 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-03-06 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |