UT SJR013 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-16 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Recognizing Fifty Years of Emergency Medicine as a Medical Specialty
Title
Joint Resolution Recognizing Fifty Years of Emergency Medicine as a Medical Specialty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-05 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-05 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-02-28 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-02-28 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-23 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-23 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |