UT SJR013 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Urging Governor and Utah's Congressional Delegation to Secure Utah State Land
Title
Joint Resolution Urging Governor and Utah's Congressional Delegation to Secure Utah State Land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-03-06 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HCLERK |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTNAE |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE |
2013-02-21 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTNAE |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-19 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-19 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |