UT SJR011 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-31 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-31 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Rules Resolution -- Workload Reporting
Title
Joint Rules Resolution -- Workload Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-02-27 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-02-27 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-02-27 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-02-26 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-17 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |