UT SJR011 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Urging Congress to Provide the Necessary Funding for Completion of the Central Utah Project
Title
Joint Resolution Urging Congress to Provide the Necessary Funding for Completion of the Central Utah Project
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-02-24 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-24 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-24 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2017-02-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-14 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-14 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-01 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |