UT SJR011 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Rules Resolution - Informal Poll on United States Senate Candidates
Title
Joint Rules Resolution - Informal Poll on United States Senate Candidates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTGOP | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in SSTGOP | |
2012-01-31 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-27 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |