UT SJR010 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution -- Property Tax Exemption for Wildfire Prevention
Title
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution -- Property Tax Exemption for Wildfire Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-03 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Fire Control
Forestry and Fire
Legislative Operations
Natural Resources
Property Tax
Property Tax Relief
Resolutions
Revenue and Taxation
Utah Constitutional Amendments
Forestry and Fire
Legislative Operations
Natural Resources
Property Tax
Property Tax Relief
Resolutions
Revenue and Taxation
Utah Constitutional Amendments