UT SJR009 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Urging Interstate Sharing of Putative Father Registry Information
Title
Joint Resolution Urging Interstate Sharing of Putative Father Registry Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-07 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTHHS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL |
2014-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL |
2014-02-19 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |