UT SJR007 | 2020 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Authorizing Pay of In-session Employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Authorizing Pay of In-session Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31 Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2020-02-25SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2020-02-25SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-25 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-25 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-25 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2020-02-25SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2020-02-24SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2020-02-24SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2020-02-24HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2020-02-24HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2020-02-24HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker
2020-02-20SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2020-02-20SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2020-02-19SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2020-02-19SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2020-02-19HouseHouse/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-19HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-19HouseSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-18HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-13HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2020-02-13HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee
2020-02-12HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee
2020-02-06HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee
2020-02-05HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2020-02-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2020-02-04HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2020-02-04HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2020-02-04SenateSenate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-02-04SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-01-30SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-01-29SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2020-01-28SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2020-01-28SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2020-01-27 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-01-27 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback