UT SJR007 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Amending Rules of Criminal Procedure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Amending Rules of Criminal Procedure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 2 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2017-03-06SenateSenate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2017-02-21SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-21SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-07SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-07SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-04SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-02SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-02-02SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2017-02-01SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2017-02-01SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2017-02-01SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2017-01-31SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee
2017-01-27SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-01-27SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-01-26 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-01-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback