UT SJR007 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution on Wild Horses and Burros

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution on Wild Horses and Burros

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-18 Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2015-03-18SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2015-03-17SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2015-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2015-03-06 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-03-06 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-03-05 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2015-03-05SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2015-03-05SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2015-03-05SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2015-03-05HouseHouse/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
2015-03-05HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
2015-03-03HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
2015-03-03HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2015-03-03HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2015-03-03HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2015-02-25HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2015-02-24HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2015-02-24 House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2015-02-24 Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2015-02-24 Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2015-02-24SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2015-02-23SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2015-02-23SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-02-23SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-02-23SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-02-06SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2015-02-06SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2015-02-05SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2015-02-02SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2015-01-30SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Rules Committee
2015-01-29SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2015-01-29SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2015-01-29 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2015-01-28 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-01-28 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2015-01-28 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback