UT SJR007 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-25 - Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution on the United Nations Children's Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution on the United Nations Children's Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-25 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2010-01-20 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSEC
2010-01-19 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSEC
2010-01-14 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2010-01-14 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback