UT SJR005 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Supporting Proposed Federal Changes to Distributions to Utah Navajo Trust Fund
Title
Joint Resolution Supporting Proposed Federal Changes to Distributions to Utah Navajo Trust Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-02-22 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-22 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-22 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2017-02-22 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2017-02-22 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2017-02-22 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-02-22 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-02-22 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-02-16 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-02-16 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-08 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-08 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-01-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-01-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |