UT SJR004 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution -- Filling Judicial Vacancies
Title
Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution -- Filling Judicial Vacancies
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Printing in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-23 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-16 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-01-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Constitutional Officers
Government Operations (State Issues)
Governor
Judges
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Resolutions
Utah Constitutional Amendments
Government Operations (State Issues)
Governor
Judges
Judicial Administration
Judicial Operations
Resolutions
Utah Constitutional Amendments
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/static/SJR004.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2020/bills/sbillint/SJR004.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2020/SJR004.fn.pdf |