UT SJR003 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution to Terminate Public Health Orders Pertaining to Face Coverings
Title
Joint Resolution to Terminate Public Health Orders Pertaining to Face Coverings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-21 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-01-27 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-01-27 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-01-21 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-01-21 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-01-21 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-01-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Counties
County Officers
Health
Legislative Operations
Local Health Departments
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Health
Resolutions
County Officers
Health
Legislative Operations
Local Health Departments
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Public Health
Resolutions