UT SJR002 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Pending: House Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution - Property Tax Exemptions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposal to Amend Utah Constitution - Property Tax Exemptions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-02-14HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2018-02-14HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2018-02-14HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2018-02-14SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-02-13SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2018-02-13SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-09SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-02-09SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-01-26SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2018-01-26SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-01-25SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-01-22SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
2018-01-22SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2018-01-22SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-01-19SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-01-19SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-01-16SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2018-01-05 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2018-01-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback