UT SJR002 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-21 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution on Taiwan
Title
Joint Resolution on Taiwan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-21 | Senate/ substituted in SSUB | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTWED | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2012-02-03 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTWED | |
2012-02-02 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED | |
2012-02-02 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-01 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-31 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-31 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-31 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |