UT SCR012 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-22 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Urging Congress to Clearly Delegate Responsibility for Regulating Hydraulic Fracturing to the States
Title
Concurrent Resolution Urging Congress to Clearly Delegate Responsibility for Regulating Hydraulic Fracturing to the States
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-16 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-16 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-16 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-08 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-08 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2012-03-08 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-06 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-06 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2012-03-01 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-01 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SINTRO | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2012-02-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-27 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |