UT SCR012 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wear Red Month Concurrent Resolution
Title
Wear Red Month Concurrent Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-28 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-02-25 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-25 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTWED | |
2011-02-23 | House/ to standing committee in HSTWED | |
2011-02-22 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTWED | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTWED | |
2011-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |